+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-1)
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
March 28, 2019: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 8, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor