+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
On April 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 785565/1 Report Adopted
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment 323323/1 (Senator Bates) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 114839/1 Report Adopted
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 6, 2018: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 8, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46