+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims – Alterations and Repeal of Sunset
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Referred Health and Government Operations Judiciary
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims – Alterations and Repeal of Sunset
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims – Alterations and Repeal of Sunset
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2022: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- Yeas: 136
February 24, 2022: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
February 21, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
February 21, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
January 24, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor