+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 557774/1 Report Adopted
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
557774/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2019: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 27, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
February 22, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 19, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor