+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Referred Judiciary
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {263324/1 Adopted
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-802 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2022: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- Yeas: 136
February 24, 2022: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45