+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {662414/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Judiciary
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {288976/1 Adopted
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Text - First - Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
- Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On October 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 13-204 - Article - Commercial Law
- 11-209 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 13-601 through 13-609 - Article - Estates and Trusts
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
April 8, 2021: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- Yeas: 137
March 19, 2021: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45