+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing canceled
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Ways and Means
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-1)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Constitutional Amendment - Gaming - Expansion
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Text - First - Constitutional Amendment - Gaming - Expansion
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Statute Amended
- 1 - Article - XIX - Video Lottery Terminals
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (46-1)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
January 28, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor