+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On November 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-301.1 - Article - Election Law
+ − Vote
February 11, 2019: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor