+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
- Passed Enrolled
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment 523126/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-84)
- Favorable with Amendments 155465/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Floor Amendment 433827/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32)
- Favorable with Amendments 499136/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment 583924/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32)
- Floor Amendment 363925/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31)
- Floor Amendment 283527/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-31)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 499136/1
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 499136/1
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-217 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (9)
April 5, 2018: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 2, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 28, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 27, 2018: House Floor - Floor Amendment {523126/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 84
March 12, 2018: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {433827/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 32
March 12, 2018: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {583924/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 32
March 12, 2018: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {363925/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 31
March 12, 2018: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {283527/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 31
March 7, 2018: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor