+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-40)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 496682/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (25-21)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (29-18)
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 604031/1
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 604031/1
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-101 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (6)
April 8, 2019: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
April 2, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 40
March 4, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 21
February 28, 2019: Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 18
February 25, 2019: House - Committee - Appropriations
February 25, 2019: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor