+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
- Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (120-10)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2019: House - Committee - Economic Matters
April 2, 2019: House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
- Yeas: 120
- Nays: 10
April 2, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
March 7, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46