+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (129-6)
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {783721/1 Adopted
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 19, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Referred Ways and Means
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Anne Arundel County and City of Annapolis - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {103327/1 Adopted
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Local State of Emergency
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-1501 - Article - Economic Development
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2022: Third Reading Passed (129-6)
- Yeas: 129
- Nays: 6
April 7, 2022: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 17, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46