+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/14 at 1:45 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/13 at 1:45 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing cancelled
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Montgomery County Senators
Type:
Primary Sponsor