+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-1)
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {764531/1 Report Adopted
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
764531/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-112 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor