+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (35-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {340414/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendment
340414/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 35
April 1, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
February 20, 2017: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor