+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-2)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {684633/1 Report Adopted
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
684633/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-807 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 23, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 2
March 7, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsor
Montgomery County Senators
Type:
Primary Sponsor