+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
- Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicle Offenses – Following Too Closely – Unified Truck Travel
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-1)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Environment and Transportation
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
- Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Offenses – Following Too Closely – Unified Truck Travel
- Favorable Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On January 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
- Hearing canceled
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Motor Vehicle Offenses – Following Too Closely – Unified Truck Travel
- Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 21-310 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2021: Third Reading Passed (131-1)
- Yeas: 131
- Nays: 1
January 29, 2021: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
January 26, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
January 4, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor