+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (120-15)
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2018: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 28, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 120
- Nays: 15
March 19, 2018: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 17, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor