+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 103
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (106-27)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Environment and Transportation
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {747372/1 Adopted
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-646 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
March 17, 2020: Third Reading Passed (106-27)
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 27
March 12, 2020: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 9, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
January 23, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor