+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/05 at 11:45 a.m.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
April 1, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 25, 2016: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor