+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Environment and Transportation
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (38-8)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {653325/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted (36-10)
- Floor Amendment {223226/1 (Senator Jennings) Withdrawn
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {223226/1 (Senator Jennings)
- Favorable with Amendments Adopted
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable
- Motion Special Order until 2/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Hough) Adopted
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {984332/1
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
- Text - First - Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On July 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-2301 - Article - Environment
+ − Votes (3)
February 11, 2020: Third Reading Passed (38-8)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 8
February 7, 2020: Floor Amendment {653325/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted (36-10)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 10