+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {367173/1 Report Adopted
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
367173/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 19-202 - Article - Insurance
- 19-205 - Article - Insurance
- 19-206 - Article - Insurance
- 19-206.1 - Article - Insurance
- 19-207 - Article - Insurance
- 19-209.1 - Article - Insurance
- 19-210 - Article - Insurance
- 19-214 - Article - Insurance
- 19-215 - Article - Insurance
- 27-501 - Article - Insurance
- 27-601.2 - Article - Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 28, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
February 15, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 9, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor