+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (88-49)
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (31-14)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 717975/1 Report Adopted
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
717975/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 17-202 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2018: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 28, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 49
March 15, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 14