+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2013: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 27, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
March 8, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46