+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
- Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
- Special Order until later today (Senator Raskin) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
- Special Order until later today (Senator Raskin) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
- Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Raskin) Adopted
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 4/01 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {238074/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendment
238074/01
Incomplete
+ − Vote
March 28, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor