+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {295162/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 4/08 at 2:20 p.m.
- Rereferred to Ways and Means
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
295162/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-208 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 10, 2017: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 4, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
April 3, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 29, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor