+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {453724/1 Adopted
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {569932/1
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-204 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 1, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
February 18, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47