+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-1)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {317970/1 Report Adopted
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
317970/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-103 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 23, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 130
- Nays: 1
March 3, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 29, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor