+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Failed (20-25)
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 4/1 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted (31-12)
- Favorable
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
- Favorable
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
- Favorable
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
- Favorable
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Raskin) Adopted
- Favorable
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-201 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Failed
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 25
March 23, 2013: Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Klausmeier) Adopted
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 12
March 18, 2013: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor