+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 223
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (111-21)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Hearing canceled
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Judiciary
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {728273/1 Adopted
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 1-203.1 - Article - Criminal Procedure
+ − Votes (4)
March 16, 2020: Third Reading Passed (111-21)
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 21
February 20, 2020: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
February 17, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
January 28, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor