+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Referred Environment and Transportation
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-511 - Article - Agriculture
+ − Votes (4)
March 17, 2020: Third Reading Passed (133-0)
- Yeas: 133
February 20, 2020: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
February 17, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
January 23, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor