+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {377379/1 Report Adopted
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
377379/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-105.2 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 25, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 3, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 29, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor