+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {537578/1 Report Adopted
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
537578/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-210 - Article - Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
April 1, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
February 16, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 11, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor