+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (119-16)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-1)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On November 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-410 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2013: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
March 31, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 119
- Nays: 16
March 20, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor