+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 150
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Referred Judiciary
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Floor Amendment {223827/1 (Senator Sydnor) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {223827/1 (Senator Sydnor)
- Favorable with Amendments {328673/1 Adopted
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
- Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 7-504.1 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
- 17-201, 17-204 through 17-207, 17-209, 26-201, 26-204, 27-103 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
March 17, 2020: Third Reading Passed (134-0)
- Yeas: 134
March 13, 2020: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46