+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (29-18)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {973528/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (15-32)
- Floor Amendment {863423/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (17-28)
- Floor Amendment {823521/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (20-27)
- Floor Amendment {403522/2 (Senator Zirkin) Rejected (20-26)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Floor Amendment {973625/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
- Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Middleton) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {403522/2 (Senator Zirkin)
- Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Committee Amendment (Senator Middleton) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {943122/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {103428/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (25-19)
- Motion Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (19-27)
- Floor Amendment {223624/1 (Senator Norman) Rejected (17-28)
- Floor Amendment {743823/3 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (18-27)
- Floor Amendment {923327/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (18-25)
- Floor Amendment {323223/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (17-27)
- Floor Amendment {283323/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-27)
- Floor Amendment {463028/1 (Senator Brochin) Withdrawn
- Floor Amendment {803122/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (16-26)
- Floor Amendment {963329/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (18-26)
- Floor Amendment {993727/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (18-26)
- Floor Amendment {783929/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (16-27)
- Floor Amendment {753120/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-28)
- Floor Amendment {903527/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (19-25)
- Floor Amendment {523227/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (16-28)
- Floor Amendment {523229/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (19-26)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {923529/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted (27-19)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {717870/1
- Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
- Committee Amendment Withdrawn
- Substitute Committee Amendment {717870/2 Adopted
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {717870/1
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendments (24)
973528/01
Rejected
863423/01
Rejected
823521/01
Rejected
973625/01
Adopted
403522/02
Rejected
993727/01
Rejected
963329/01
Rejected
923529/01
Adopted
903527/01
Rejected
803122/01
Rejected
783929/01
Rejected
753120/01
Rejected
523229/01
Rejected
523227/01
Rejected
943122/01
Adopted
923327/01
Rejected
743823/03
Rejected
463028/01
Withdrawn
323223/01
Rejected
283323/01
Rejected
223624/01
Rejected
103428/01
Adopted
717870/02
Adopted
717870/01
Withdrawn
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (22)
March 16, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 18
March 15, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {823521/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 27
March 15, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {863423/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 28
March 15, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {973528/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 32
March 15, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {403522/2 (Senator Zirkin) Rejected
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 26
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {523227/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 28
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {523229/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 26
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {743823/3 (Senator Serafini) Rejected
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 27
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {753120/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 28
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {783929/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 27
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {903527/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 25
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {923327/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 25
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {923529/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 19
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {963329/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 26
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {993727/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 26
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Motion to Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Cassilly) Rejected
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 27
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {803122/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 26
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 19
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {223624/1 (Senator Norman) Rejected
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 28
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {283323/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 27
March 10, 2017: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {323223/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 27
March 7, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor