+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-1)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {888175/1 Report Adopted
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On July 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
888175/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-309 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2017: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 28, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 1
March 15, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47