+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-506 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2017: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 28, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
February 23, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 20, 2017: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor