+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {234835/1 Report Adopted
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
234835/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-101 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 27, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
March 10, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor