+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred Economic Matters
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension
- First Reading Finance
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
On September 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-1002 - Article - Business Regulation
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2022: Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- Yeas: 138
January 27, 2022: Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Yeas: 44
January 24, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
January 6, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor