+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
On April 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {196182/2 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reassigned to Health and Government Operations
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {864939/1 Report Adopted
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
April 3, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
April 1, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
February 15, 2016: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor