+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Carey, Charkoudian and Howard)
- House Refuses Recede
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Carey, Charkoudian and Howard)
- House Refuses Recede
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hayes, Beidle and Ready)
- Senate Requests House Recede
- Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hayes, Beidle and Ready)
- Senate Requests House Recede
- Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
- Favorable with Amendments {233226/1 Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred Economic Matters
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {193021/1 Adopted
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - First - State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
- First Reading Finance
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
On September 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 16-802 - Article - Business Occupations and Professions
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2022: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- Yeas: 136
February 10, 2022: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
February 7, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
January 6, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor