+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
April 3, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
February 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 1, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor