+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to Finance
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 25-504 - Article - Public Utilities
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor