+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Environment and Transportation
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-0)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Public Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Secretaries of Principal Departments (Shut the Revolving Door Act of 2020)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Public Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Secretaries of Principal Departments (Shut the Revolving Door Act of 2020)
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-504 - Article - General Provisions
+ − Votes (2)
February 21, 2020: Third Reading Passed (43-0)
- Yeas: 43
January 23, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor