+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-109.1 - Article - Real Property
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2013: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
February 15, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
February 12, 2013: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor