+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {366686/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {164739/1 Report Adopted
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 31, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 28, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor