+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {927673/1 Report Adopted
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
927673/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 19-349.1 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2013: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 29, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
February 7, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 4, 2013: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor