+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {257473/1 Report Adopted
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
257473/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-117 - Article - Family Law
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
February 23, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
February 18, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor