+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (123-12)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {967477/1 Report Adopted
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
967477/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 23, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 123
- Nays: 12
February 13, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
February 10, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor